CA AB2718 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 459.5 and 490.2 of, and to add Section 490.3 to, the Penal Code, relating to theft.
Title
Crimes: theft.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 459.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 490.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 490.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |