CA AB2791 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51036 and 51038 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Sidewalk vendors: annual fairs.
Sponsors
Asm. Lori Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51038 | Amended Code | Citation Text |