CA SB1240 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 20508.3 to the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Public Employees’ Retirement System: contracting agencies: consolidation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1240 Alvarado-Gil Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3563.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 20508.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |