CA SB1299 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.) Ordered to the Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.) Ordered to the Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 62.5 of, and to add Section 3212.81 to, the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Farmworkers: benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1299 Cortese (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3726.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3563.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212.81 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 62.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |