GA HB1021 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act establishing the State Court of Spalding County, formerly known as the City Court of Griffin, approved December 14, 1897 (Ga. L. 1897, p. 462), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 19, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 4527), so as to provide for the election of the county solicitor; to specify the requirements for holding the office of the county solicitor; to establish the office of the county solicitor as a full-time position; to designate the salary of the office of the county solicitor; to authorize the appointment of assistant county solicitors; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Spalding County; State Court; provide election of county solicitor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #486 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Vote #565 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Vote #565 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 552 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House Hopper |