GA HB798 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 7 of Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to HOPE scholarships and grants, so as to provide for eligibility for Zell Miller Scholarships for home study students who receive certain scores on standardized college admission tests; to revise eligibility requirements for HOPE scholarships for entering freshmen students who are home study students regarding scores on standardized college admission tests; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
HOPE; home study students who receive certain scores on standardized college admission tests; provide eligibility
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Chandler [R] | Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] |
Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. David Clark [R] | Sen. Marty Harbin [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #887 (Y: 162 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Vote #536 (Y: 164 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Vote #536 (Y: 164 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 521 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-22 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-21 | House | House Hopper |