GA SB581 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 44 of the O.C.G.A., relating to determination of boundaries, so as to designate the most recent systems of plane coordinates for defining and stating geographic positions within this state as the Georgia State Plane Coordinate System; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property Boundary Lines; plane coordinates for defining and stating geographic position within this state as the Georgia State Plane Coordinate System; designate
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #775 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #642 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #642 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-09 | Act 850 | |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |