GA SB610 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical assistance generally, so as to require the Department of Community Health to conduct a comprehensive review of provider reimbursement rates for home and community based services covered by the waiver programs; to provide for input from the public, service providers, and other stakeholders; to provide for proposed rate models and estimated fiscal impact; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Community Health; conduct a comprehensive review of provider reimbursement rates for home and community based services covered by the waiver programs; require
Sponsors
Sen. Sally Harrell [D] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Kim Jackson [D] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #866 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #833 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #659 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #833 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #659 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-09 | Act 853 | |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-04-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-25 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Hopper |