HI HB2365 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act 028, 05/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1128).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act 028, 05/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1128).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces the Director of Law Enforcement with the Director of Corrections and Rehabilitation on the Hawaii Interagency Council for Transit-Oriented Development. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Transit-oriented Development Planning.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Senate | Act 028, 05/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1128). |
2024-05-29 | House | Act 028, on 05/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1128). |
2024-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 8-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 8-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Chun, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Kanuha, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Elefante, Fevella. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Chun Co-Chairs; Takayama, Souza. |
2024-04-15 | House | Re-referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 588) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3792) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3321) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Fevella. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-20-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 354). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9). |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-21-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3054 (Same As) 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.