IN HB1138 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Law 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Law 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professional licensing matters. Removes references to a quality review in provisions relating to the licensing of accountants. Requires the Indiana board of accountancy (board) to adopt rules requiring the firm to allow the administering entity to provide access to the results of its most recently accepted peer review and other objective information to the board. Removes language requiring the administering entity to make a peer review report available to the oversight committee not more than 30 days after the issuance of the peer review report. Provides that the results of a peer review may be treated as a complaint submitted by the board. Removes language requiring the peer review committee issuing a report to cooperate with an investigation of a complaint. Allows the use of certain titles by an individual who is enrolled in or has graduated from a school or college of architecture or an accredited curriculum of landscape architecture. Specifies that the renewal of a professional geologist license after June 30, 2025, requires continuing education. Allows certain individuals to take various licensing examinations early if certain conditions are met. Increases the number of clinical or supervised hours certain individuals may obtain through virtual supervision.
Title
Professional licensing matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Public Law 83 |
2024-03-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 243: yeas 87, nays 0 |
2024-02-28 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 193: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Zay) prevailed; voice vote |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senator Crane added as cosponsor |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2024-01-30 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Zay and Crider |
2024-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-29 | House | Representative VanNatter added as coauthor |
2024-01-29 | House | Representative Goodrich added as coauthor |
2024-01-29 | House | Representative Rowray E added as coauthor |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2024-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Goss-Reaves |