LA SB13 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-11-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-11-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to reporting of state expenditures through the fiscal transparency website. (Item #32) (7/1/18) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to reporting of state expenditures through the fiscal transparency website. (Item #32) (7/1/18) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 13 CONCUR (#94) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#68) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#32) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#68) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#32) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2018. |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/6/2018. |
2018-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/6/2018. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-06-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-06-04 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2018-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/2018. |
2018-06-03 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-06-03 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-06-03 | House | Reported with amendments (18-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-31 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |