MD HB230 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the maximum maturity date of school construction bonds that the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners may issue; and requiring the Board to submit a report on or before December 1, 2011, to specified committees of the State legislature on a long-term plan for the alignment of public school facilities with projected enrollments and educational programs within the Baltimore City Public School System.
Title
Baltimore City - Education - Public School Facilities and Construction Bond
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Talmadge Branch [D] | Del. Luke Clippinger [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] |
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Del. Shawn Tarrant [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-04-11 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2011-04-06 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-09 | Returned Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (118-21) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2011-01-28 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-01-28 | First Reading Appropriations |