ME LD2027 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Property Tax Exemption, Business Equipment Tax Exemption and Business Equipment Tax Reimbursement for Facilities Storing Spent Nuclear Fuel and Radioactive Waste
Title
An Act Regarding the Property Tax Exemption, Business Equipment Tax Exemption and Business Equipment Tax Reimbursement for Facilities Storing Spent Nuclear Fuel and Radioactive Waste
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #426 (Y: 118 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #622 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #622 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2024-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-28 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2024-03-27 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-602). |
2024-03-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-602) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-03-27 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-03-27 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 426 (Yeas 118 - Nays 25 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2024-03-27 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-27 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-602) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-602) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-03-26 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 622 Yeas 28 - Nays 6 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-03-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-02-27 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 11, 2023 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |