MN HF3763 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture supplemental budget bill.
Title
Agriculture supplemental budget bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Anderson, P. E. |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3955 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance