MS HB716 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish A Commission On Starkville Consolidated School District Structure To Make Recommendations To The 2014 Regular Session Of The Legislature Regarding The Method For Consolidating The County Into One School District With One Local School Board; To Provide That In Oktibbeha County There Shall Be An Administrative Consolidation Into One School District To Be Designated As Starkville Consolidated School District, Which Shall Be A Countywide Municipal Separate School District Effective July 1, 2015; To Provide That Until Such Time Consolidation Becomes Effective, The Oktibbeha County School District Shall Remain Under Conservatorship Of The Mississippi Recovery School District; To Provide For The Composition Of The Board Of Trustees Of The New Starkville Consolidated School District; To Direct The State Board Of Education To Administratively Consolidate Any School District Which Does Not Voluntarily Follow The Consolidation Order; To Abolish The Former School District Following The Administrative Consolidation And Provide For The Transfer Of School District Assets And Liabilities; To Provide For Execution Of Teacher And School District Employee Contracts And The Preparation Of A School District Budget In The New School District; To Direct The State Board Of Education To Promulgate Regulations To Implement Such Administrative Consolidation; To Provide A Two-year Waiver From Accountability And State Assessment Requirements For The New Student Population; To Amend Section 37-7-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School district consolidation; require in certain county.
Sponsors
Rep. Toby Barker [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Collins,Smith |
2013-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Moore,Chism,Barker |
2013-03-18 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2013-02-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed |
2013-02-13 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-05 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Education |