NE LB1200 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - DeKay explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - DeKay explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to motor vehicles, roads, excise taxes, and federal law and regulations and provide for coordination of the 911 service system and the 988 suicide and crisis lifeline
Title
Change provisions relating to motor vehicles, roads, excise taxes, and federal law and regulations and provide for coordination of the 911 service system and the 988 suicide and crisis lifeline
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moser [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM2508 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM2508 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | DeKay explanation of vote |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER86 adopted |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER86 filed |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER86 |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2508 adopted |
2024-02-23 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2508 filed |
2024-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2508 |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill |
2024-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2024 |
2024-01-19 | Legislature | Holdcroft name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |