NH SB436 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to maximum benefits payable in unemployment compensation.
Title
Relative to maximum benefits payable in unemployment compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Moved Inexpedient to Legislate; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Report: No Recommendation, 04/05/2024, Vote 2-2; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |