NM HB2 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 210 - Apr. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 210 - Apr. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Appropriation Act Of 2023
Title
General Appropriation Act Of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 210 - Apr. 7 |
2023-03-15 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2023-03-12 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:25 N:16 |
2023-03-12 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:52 N:17 |
2023-02-15 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2023-01-19 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |