NM SB88 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 13 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 13 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic Driver's License Credentials
Title
Electronic Driver's License Credentials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 13 - Feb. 28 |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:53 N:8 |
2024-02-12 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-08 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-06 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HTRC |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2024-02-03 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-31 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2024-01-18 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/STBTC/SJC |