NM SM106 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study 211 helpline in bernalillo
Title
Study 211 helpline in bernalillo
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | [LD 51] Signed by one or both houses |
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Rules |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |