NY A07020 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the young farmer advisory board on agriculture to become the beginning farmer advisory board on agriculture.
Title
Expands the young farmer advisory board on agriculture to become the beginning farmer advisory board on agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.104 |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.104 |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | print number 7020a |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S09248 (Same As) 2024-05-23 - 2ND REPORT CAL.