NY A10010 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the qualifications for holding the office of assistant county attorney in the county of Herkimer; permits holders of such office to reside outside Herkimer county.
Title
Relates to the qualifications for holding the office of assistant county attorney in the county of Herkimer; permits holders of such office to reside outside Herkimer county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1426 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9128 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.207 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.207 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S09128 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10010