OK HB3766 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Poor persons; care of indigent persons; repealer; effective date.
Title
Poor persons; care of indigent persons; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2024-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Alvord; authored by Senator Kidd |
2024-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1 |
2024-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Alvord (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-05 | House | General Order |
2024-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Cantrell |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |