OK HB3802 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Vetoed 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Vetoed 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; automobiles owned by the state; authorizing the purchase of certain vehicles; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; automobiles owned by the state; authorizing the purchase of certain vehicles; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Burns [R] | Sen. Chuck Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Vetoed 04/23/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2024-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-04 | House | General Order |
2024-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Burns |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |