OK HB4035 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; public pools and spas; regulations; State Department of Health; exceptions; rules; public nuisance; repealer; public pools and spas regulations and guidelines; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; public pools and spas; regulations; State Department of Health; exceptions; rules; public nuisance; repealer; public pools and spas regulations and guidelines; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6 |
2024-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner, Cantrell |
2024-03-04 | House | General Order |
2024-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Townley |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |