OR SB1526 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date, June 6, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date, June 6, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Act makes changes to certain Oregon tax laws. It takes effect on the 91st day after session ends. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.9). Makes technical, policy and administrative changes to certain Oregon tax laws. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to changes to certain Oregon tax laws; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Effective date, June 6, 2024. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 52, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Cramer, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Hieb. |
2024-03-06 | House | Second reading. |
2024-03-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2024-03-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2024-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |