PA HB1031 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10)
Status: Passed on July 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - Act No. 6 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10)
Status: Passed on July 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - Act No. 6 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the boat access located on the West Branch of the Susquehanna River in Muncy Creek Township, Lycoming County, as the Representative Garth Everett Muncy Access Area.
Title
Designating the boat access located on the West Branch of the Susquehanna River in Muncy Creek Township, Lycoming County, as the Representative Garth Everett Muncy Access Area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1031 PN 1047, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1031 PN 1047, motion to agree to the bill on second consideration (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1031 PN 1047, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1031 PN 1047, motion to agree to the bill on second consideration (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1031 PN 1047, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-11 | Senate | Act No. 6 of 2023 |
2023-07-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2023-07-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration, *opening vote* June 21, 2023 (50-0) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2023-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2023-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2023-05-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-05-03 | House | First consideration |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |