PA HB2234 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 40 (Insurance) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions relating to health insurance markets oversight, further providing for definitions; in State-based exchange, further providing for powers and duties of exchange authority; and, in reinsurance program, further providing for application.
Title
In preliminary provisions relating to health insurance markets oversight, further providing for definitions; in State-based exchange, further providing for powers and duties of exchange authority; and, in reinsurance program, further providing for application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 2234 PN 3056, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 106 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2234 PN 3056, 2023 A4697 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2234 PN 3056, 2023 A4680 (Y: 101 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-06 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A04257 (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 2234 PN 3056, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 106 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2234 PN 3056, 2023 A4697 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2234 PN 3056, 2023 A4680 (Y: 101 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-06 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A04257 (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2024-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (106-96) |
2024-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-04 | House | Second consideration |
2024-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2024-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-05-06 | House | First consideration |
2024-05-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2024-04-24 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |