PA HR298 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the week of March 10 through 16, 2024, as "Sunshine Week" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the week of March 10 through 16, 2024, as "Sunshine Week" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | House | Removed from table |
2024-05-07 | House | Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71) |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |