SC H4786 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Office Of The Governor, Relating To Local Emergency Preparedness Standards, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4563, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code
Title
Local emergency preparedness standards (D. No. 4563)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Act No. 302 | |
2016-05-26 | Effective date 05/23/16 | |
2016-05-23 | Became law without Governor's signature | |
2016-05-17 | Ratified R 187 | |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on General |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |