SD SB139 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permit the secretary of state to cancel a trademark or service mark registration under certain conditions.
Title
Permit the secretary of state to cancel a trademark or service mark registration under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Rep. Lance Carson [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] |
Sen. Art Fryslie [R] | Sen. Cooper Garnos [R] | Rep. Noel Hamiel [R] | Sen. Shantel Krebs [R] |
Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Ed McLaughlin [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Rep. Steve Street [D] |
Sen. Mike Vehle [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Reconsidered (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Reconsidered (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-12 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 670 | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 847 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 636 | |
2010-03-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 787 | |
2010-03-08 | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 139ota | |
2010-03-08 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 717 | |
2010-03-08 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 139ob | |
2010-03-08 | State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 139oa | |
2010-03-08 | State Affairs Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. | |
2010-02-24 | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 599 | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-10 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 351 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 268 | |
2010-02-03 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. S.J. 221 | |
2010-02-03 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 139ja | |
2010-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 167 |