SD SB148 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions pertaining to the withdrawal of blood to determine alcohol content.
Title
Revise certain provisions pertaining to the withdrawal of blood to determine alcohol content.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Abdallah [R] | Sen. Joni Cutler [R] | Rep. Richard Engels [D] | Sen. Margaret Gillespie [D] |
Sen. Bob Gray [R] | Rep. Roger Hunt [R] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 639 | |
2010-03-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 769 | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-03-08 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 716 | |
2010-03-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-23 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 569 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 407 | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 389 | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-18 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 364 | |
2010-02-18 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-16 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 169 |