SD SB90 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and repeal provisions related to forcible entry and detainer.
Title
Revise and repeal provisions related to forcible entry and detainer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 04, 2024 S.J. 464 |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 446 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 447 |
2024-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 10. H.J. 413 |
2024-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 406 |
2024-02-23 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 216 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 2. S.J. 205 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 90A |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 95 |