TN HB2938 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a process for the department to issue licenses to commercial breeders of cats and dogs. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 43 and Title 44.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 43 and Title 44, relative to commercial breeders.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee- Government Operations for Review |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2513 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee