US HB3947 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 859 North State Road 21 in Melrose, Florida, as the "Pamela Jane Rock Post Office Building".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 859 North State Road 21 in Melrose, Florida, as the "Pamela Jane Rock Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Bean [R-FL] | Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] |
Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Cory Mills [R-FL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Anna Luna [R-FL] | Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] |
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Laurel Lee [R-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] |
Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] |
Rep. Maxwell Frost [D-FL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Presented to President. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2993) |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 364. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-01-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-01-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H262) |
2024-01-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. |
2024-01-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3947. |
2024-01-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H262) |
2024-01-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-01-29 | House | Mr. Donalds moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2023-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-06-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2023-06-09 | House | Introduced in House |