VT S0181 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Environment and Energy
Pending: House Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Environment and Energy
Pending: House Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to establishing a television assessment and community media
Title
An act relating to establishing a television assessment and community media
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Environment and Energy |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Chittenden for Committee on Finance |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-26 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |