WA HB1617 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Aligning state and school holidays.
Title
Aligning state and school holidays.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Effective date 7/1/2022. |
2022-03-30 | House | Chapter 198, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2022-02-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-13 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-13 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2021-12-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |