WA HB1675 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a manufacturer of certain dialysate and dialysis devices used by home dialysis patients or a manufacturer's agent from the pharmacy practices act and legend drug act.
Title
Exempting a manufacturer of certain dialysate and dialysis devices used by home dialysis patients or a manufacturer's agent from the pharmacy practices act and legend drug act.
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Jacquelin Maycumber [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] |
Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-11 | House | Chapter 23, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-01-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-01-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-26 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-19 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2021-12-20 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5507 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 64 | 257 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 41 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |