WA SB5799 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sale of halal foods.
Title
Concerning the sale of halal foods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 245, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-21 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2059 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 130 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | New Code | See Bill Text |