WA SB5908 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing extended foster care services to youth ages 18 to 21.
Title
Providing extended foster care services to youth ages 18 to 21.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Chapter 192, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 38; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2024-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2024-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee amendment |
2024-02-27 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-20 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-10 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-08 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services. |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2218 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-16 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 34 | 030 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 34 | 267 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 13 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 13 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 13 | 336 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |