WA SB6286 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the liability and powers of cities and flood control zone districts.
Title
Concerning the liability and powers of cities and flood control zone districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Claudia Kauffman [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] |
Sen. Joe McDermott [D] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Chapter 46, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-12 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | President signed. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-11 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-02-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-09 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-28 | JUD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-27 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-01-15 | And refer to Judiciary. | |
2010-01-15 | GO - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2010-01-14 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2794 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.