WV SB192 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Protecting consumers from price gouging and unfair pricing practices
Title
Protecting consumers from price gouging and unfair pricing practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - House - Hfa Miley 3-12 #1 (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - House - Hfa Miley 3-12 #1 (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/4/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-04-04 | Approved by Governor 4/4/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/4/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-28 | To Governor 3/28/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | House receded and passed (Roll No. 477) | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-12 | Senate insisted that House recede(Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 402) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | Amendment adopted (Roll No 401) | |
2011-03-12 | Amendment reported by the Clerk | |
2011-03-12 | Reordered on the calendar | |
2011-03-12 | Placed at foot of bills on third reading | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2011-03-09 | Do pass | |
2011-02-02 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-02-02 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-01 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-01 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) | |
2011-02-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-01 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-01-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-01-31 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-01-28 | Read 1st time | |
2011-01-28 | On 1st reading | |
2011-01-27 | Reported do pass | |
2011-01-18 | To Judiciary | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-01-18 | To Judiciary | |
2011-01-18 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2537 (Same As) 2011-01-18 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46A | 6J | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46A | 6J | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46A | 6J | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |