ND HB1017 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor 04/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor 04/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of administrative hearings.
Title
AN ACT to provide appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of administrative hearings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor 04/22 |
2019-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | Concurred |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2019-02-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-08 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |