ND 1218 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 39-35 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to consumer towing protection; to amend and reenact sections 23.1-15-03, 23.1-15-05, 39-26-04, 39-26-06, 39-26-07, and subsection 2 of section 39-26-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to custody of abandoned vehicles, notice to owners of abandoned vehicles, and right to reclaim an abandoned vehicle; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Custody of abandoned vehicles, notice to owners of abandoned vehicles, and right to reclaim an abandoned vehicle; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 3 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 90
2019-01-25HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 0 3
2019-01-17HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback