ND HB1308 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 8 of section 62.1-01-01 relating to the definition of machine gun, submachine gun, or fully automatic rifle.
Title
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 8 of section 62.1-01-01 relating to the definition of machine gun, submachine gun, or fully automatic rifle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 3 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 2 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |