ND SB2060 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 39-06.1-06 and section 39-21-41.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the amount of statutory fees and the use of safety belts; to repeal section 39-21-41.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to secondary enforcement of safety belt requirements; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Secondary enforcement of safety belt requirements; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] |
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 54 |
2019-03-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2019-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-01-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 24 nays 23 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 23 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reported back without recommendation 6 0 0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |