ND SB2240 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 1-04-07, subsection 1 of section 5-01-09, sections 12.1-20-06.1 and 19-03.3-05, subdivision f of subsection 3 of section 23-01-44, section 25-03.1-01, subsections 3, 12, 13, and 23 of section 25-03.1-02, section 25-03.1-04, subsection 2 of section 25-03.1-09, sections 25-03.1-34.1, 25-03.1-34.2, and 38-10-01, subdivision l of subsection 1 of section 43-05-16, section 43-05-16.4, subsection 3 of section 43-17.1-06, subsection 3 of section 50-25.1-16, and section 50-25.1-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to references to substance abuse disorders.
Title
References to substance abuse disorders.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Charles Damschen [R] |
Rep. Jon Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 72 nays 18 |
2019-03-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |