AK HB149 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT, STAPP
Hearing: May 3 @ 9:00 am in Adams 519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT, STAPP
Hearing: May 3 @ 9:00 am in Adams 519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the licensure of nursing professionals; relating to a multistate nurse licensure compact; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Nursing: Licensure; Multistate Compact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT, STAPP |
2024-01-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER |
2023-04-28 | House | FIN REPLACES MLV REFERRAL |
2023-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE, SHAW, MCKAY, D.JOHNSON, CRONK |
2023-04-03 | House | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2023-04-03 | House | MLV REFERRAL MOVED TO AFTER L&C |
2023-03-31 | House | MLV, L&C |
2023-03-31 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Boards & Commissions
Business
Civil Procedure
Compacts
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Intergovernmental Relations
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Nursing Homes
Occupations & Professions
Public Assistance
Boards & Commissions
Business
Civil Procedure
Compacts
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Intergovernmental Relations
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Nursing Homes
Occupations & Professions
Public Assistance
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB149 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0149A.PDF |