AK HB156 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - COSPONSOR(S): STORY
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - COSPONSOR(S): STORY
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to industrial hemp; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Industrial Hemp Program;manufacturing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2021-05-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY |
2021-05-04 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-05-04 | House | FN2: (DNR) |
2021-05-04 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON, WOOL, JOHNSON, ORTIZ, LEBON |
2021-05-04 | House | DP: RASMUSSEN, EDGMON, THOMPSON, MERRICK |
2021-05-04 | House | FIN RPT CS(RES) 4DP 5NR |
2021-04-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, RASMUSSEN |
2021-04-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2021-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NELSON, MCCABE |
2021-04-14 | House | FN1: (DNR) |
2021-04-14 | House | NR: GILLHAM |
2021-04-14 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, HANNAN, RAUSCHER, HOPKINS, CRONK, FIELDS, MCKAY, PATKOTAK |
2021-04-14 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) 8DP 1NR |
2021-04-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN |
2021-04-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER, RAUSCHER |
2021-03-31 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES |
2021-03-31 | House | L&C REFERRAL REMOVED |
2021-03-29 | House | L&C, RES |
2021-03-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB156 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0156A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0156B.PDF |