AK HB182 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the fishery resource landing tax credit for certain taxpayers that harvest fishery resources under the provisions of a community development quota; providing for an effective date by amending the effective date of secs. 16 and 23, ch. 61, SLA 2014; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Fishery Resource Land. Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2021-06-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 7 SLA 21 |
2021-06-09 | House | 4:30 P.M. 6/7/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-19 | Senate | VERSION: HB 182 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-19 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 182 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-19 | Senate | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR UC |
2021-05-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | FN1: (REV) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2021-05-18 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP |
2021-05-10 | Senate | FIN |
2021-05-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-07 | House | VERSION: HB 182 |
2021-05-07 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-07 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-07 | House | PASSED Y35 N2 E3 |
2021-05-07 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 182 |
2021-05-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-07 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2021 |
2021-05-07 | House | FN1: (REV) |
2021-05-07 | House | MERRICK |
2021-05-07 | House | DP: RASMUSSEN, THOMPSON, ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, CARPENTER, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, |
2021-05-07 | House | FIN RPT 9DP |
2021-04-28 | House | FN1: (REV) |
2021-04-28 | House | NR: MCCABE, VANCE |
2021-04-28 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, STORY, TARR |
2021-04-28 | House | FSH RPT 4DP 2NR |
2021-04-19 | House | FSH, FIN |
2021-04-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |